Governments and ministers since 1917
On this page, you can browse information about the governments of Finland by name, term, number of days in office or Prime Minister’s political party and see whether the government was a majority, minority or caretaker government. Ministers can be organised by name, political party and total number of days as minister. Information is available for all governments of Finland since it gained independence.
Arvo Pentti
Personal details
Date and place of birth: 13.2.1915 Hämeenkyrö
Days in office 1419
Ministerial duties
- Aura II - Minister of Defence 29.10.1971 - 23.2.1972 (Occupation/Public Official)
- Aura - Minister of Defence 14.5.1970 - 15.7.1970 (Occupation/Public Official)
- Virolainen - Minister of Defence 12.9.1964 - 27.5.1966 (Agrarian Union)
- Karjalainen - Minister of Defence 13.4.1962 - 18.12.1963 (Agrarian Union)