Governments and ministers since 1917
On this page, you can browse information about the governments of Finland by name, term, number of days in office or Prime Minister’s political party and see whether the government was a majority, minority or caretaker government. Ministers can be organised by name, political party and total number of days as minister. Information is available for all governments of Finland since it gained independence.
Taisto Tähkämaa
Personal details
Date and place of birth: 11.12.1924 Parainen
Days in office 2183
Ministerial duties
- Sorsa III - Minister of Agriculture and Forestry 19.2.1982 - 6.5.1983 (Centre Party)
- Koivisto II - Minister of Agriculture and Forestry 26.5.1979 - 19.2.1982 (Centre Party)
- Sorsa II - Minister of Defence 15.5.1977 - 26.5.1979 (Centre Party)